Search results
Results from the Tech24 Deals Content Network
Kraft Foods Inc. Kraft Foods Inc. (/ ˈkræft /) was a multinational confectionery, food and beverage conglomerate. [4] It marketed many brands in more than 170 countries. Twelve of its brands annually earned more than $1 billion worldwide: Cadbury, Jacobs, Kraft, LU, Maxwell House, Milka, Nabisco, Oreo, Oscar Mayer, Philadelphia, Trident, and ...
Number of employees. 22,500 (2015) Parent. Kraft Heinz. Website. kraftheinzcompany.com. Kraft Foods Group, Inc. was an American food manufacturing and processing conglomerate, [2] split from Kraft Foods Inc. on October 1, 2012, and was headquartered in Chicago, Illinois. It became part of Kraft Heinz on July 2, 2015.
James Lewis Kraft (/ ˈkræft /; December 11, 1874 – February 16, 1953) was a Canadian-American entrepreneur and inventor and the founder of Kraft Foods Inc. Kraft immigrated to the United States from Canada in 1902. He developed a patented pasteurization process for cheese, allowing it to be shipped long distances, making him the first to ...
This is a list of brands developed, owned, or licensed by Mondelez International (formerly Kraft Foods Inc.). The company's core businesses are snack foods and confectionery. Kraft-branded products are made for some international territories by Mondelez International under license from Kraft Heinz Company since 2012.
Revenue. US$ 700,000,000 (1999) Owner. Texas Pacific Group. Number of employees. 4,000. Favorite Brands International was founded in 1995, when Texas Pacific Group bought Kraft Foods, Inc. confection division.
Printable version; In other projects ... Redirect page. Redirect to: Kraft Foods Inc. From a former name: ...
The rice-based Cream of Rice also forms part of the product line, and is often a recommended early food for infants and toddlers and for people who cannot tolerate wheat or gluten. [ 1 ] Cream of Wheat was owned by Nabisco from 1961 to 2000 when Nabisco was bought by Kraft Foods Inc. B&G Foods acquired the Cream of Wheat and Cream of Rice ...
[citation needed] In 1998, Holden was named executive vice president of Kraft Foods. In 2000, she was named president and CEO of Kraft Foods North America, and then in 2001 became co-CEO of Kraft Foods. In 2004, Holden was named president of Global Marketing and Category Development. She resigned from Kraft Foods Inc in 2005. References