Search results
Results from the Tech24 Deals Content Network
James Lewis Kraft (/ ˈkræft /; December 11, 1874 – February 16, 1953) was a Canadian-American entrepreneur and inventor and the founder of Kraft Foods Inc. Kraft immigrated to the United States from Canada in 1902. He developed a patented pasteurization process for cheese, allowing it to be shipped long distances, making him the first to ...
Kraft Foods Inc. (/ ˈ k r æ f t /) was a multinational confectionery, food and beverage conglomerate. [4] It marketed many brands in more than 170 countries. Twelve of its brands annually earned more than $1 billion worldwide: Cadbury, Jacobs, Kraft, LU, Maxwell House, Milka, Nabisco, Oreo, Oscar Mayer, Philadelphia, Trident, and Tang. [5]
22,500 (2015) Parent. Kraft Heinz. Website. kraftheinzcompany.com. Kraft Foods Group, Inc. was an American food manufacturing and processing conglomerate, [2] split from Kraft Foods Inc. on October 1, 2012, and was headquartered in Chicago, Illinois. It became part of Kraft Heinz on July 2, 2015.
Robert Kenneth Kraft[ 1 ] (born June 5, 1941) is an American billionaire businessman. He is the chairman and chief executive officer (CEO) of the Kraft Group, a diversified holding company with assets in paper and packaging, sports and entertainment, real estate development, and a private equity portfolio.
[citation needed] In 1998, Holden was named executive vice president of Kraft Foods. In 2000, she was named president and CEO of Kraft Foods North America, and then in 2001 became co-CEO of Kraft Foods. In 2004, Holden was named president of Global Marketing and Category Development. She resigned from Kraft Foods Inc in 2005. References
Robert A. Eckert. Robert A. "Bob" Eckert (born 1954) is an American businessman, chairman and CEO of Mattel from 2000 to 2011, CEO of Kraft Foods from 1997 to 2000, and an operating partner with the private equity firm Friedman Fleischer & Lowe.
Shares of Kraft Foods were first offered to the public via an initial public offering in 2001. Altria Group (formerly Philip Morris) spun off remaining shares of Kraft Foods to Altria shareholders in 2007. On November 4, 2015, owner Kraft Heinz announced it would move the Oscar Mayer headquarters and the company's U.S. meats business from ...
This is a list of brands developed, owned, or licensed by Mondelez International (formerly Kraft Foods Inc.). The company's core businesses are snack foods and confectionery. Kraft-branded products are made for some international territories by Mondelez International under license from Kraft Heinz Company since 2012.