Search results
Results from the Tech24 Deals Content Network
Moran in 2015. Frank A. Moran is an American state legislator serving in the Massachusetts House of Representatives. He served on the Lawrence, Massachusetts City Council from 2008 – 2013, including three years as Council President. [1] He is a member of the Massachusetts Black and Latino Legislative Caucus. [2]
In 1991, B. Lyn Behrens became the first female president of LLU. Serving until March 2008, she was succeeded by Richard Hart, who had previously served as LLU's chancellor. Loma Linda University opened its new 150,000-square-foot (14,000 m 2) Centennial Complex on October 28, 2009. The complex includes new classrooms, two large 200–400 seat ...
The Commonwealth of Massachusetts is often categorized politically as progressive and liberal. All of the state’s U.S. representatives and senators are Democrats. Democrats also form the large majority of the state’s legislature, though the state has a history of electing Republican governors. As with most states, the two main political ...
Maura Tracy Healey (born February 8, 1971) is an American lawyer and politician serving as the 73rd governor of Massachusetts since 2023. A member of the Democratic Party, she served as Massachusetts Attorney General from 2015 to 2023 and was elected governor in 2022, defeating the Republican nominee, former state representative Geoff Diehl.
You can find instant answers on our AOL Mail help page. Should you need additional assistance we have experts available around the clock at 800-730-2563.
Albert Hull [2] Residence. Sandisfield, Massachusetts. George Hull (January 8, 1788 – January 7, 1868) was an American, merchant, businessman, and politician from Massachusetts. A prominent shop owner in Sandisfield, Massachusetts, he served as the 15th lieutenant governor of Massachusetts from 1836 through 1843. [3]
The Massachusetts Executive Office of Public Safety and Security is a Commonwealth of Massachusetts organization whose focus is the protection of individuals, groups or environment issues which will, subsequently, affect individuals or groups health or well being. As an executive agency, the Office is managed by a Commissioner who is appointed ...
Jane Swift. Jane Maria Swift (born February 24, 1965) is an American politician and nonprofit executive who served as the 69th lieutenant governor of Massachusetts from 1999 to 2003 and, concurrently, as acting governor from April 2001 to January 2003. [ note 1 ] She was the first woman to perform the duties of governor of Massachusetts.